Financial history MANTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 522342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.75k £14.15k £9.75k £15.53k £19.80k
Total expenditure £7.92k £7.94k £10.62k £19.09k £13.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A