Trustees CRUCKTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 522508
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Sandells | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Calder | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Calder | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALISON BEBB | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jenn Lloyd | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jan Gaskell | Trustee | 10 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Sandells | Trustee | 01 June 1976 |
|
|
||||
ALISON DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.