Accounts and annual returns HADNALL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 30 December 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 21 February 2024 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 01 July 2024 186 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 26 January 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 26 January 2023 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 11 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required