Trustees PICKLESCOTT VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 522568
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosalind Mary Crook | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donna Maria Robinson | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Gibson | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Davis | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Day | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Elizabeth McKim | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
TONY PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.