Accounts and annual returns DOVEDALE HOUSE

Charity number: 522677
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 30 October 2017 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 30 October 2017 364 days late
Annual return 31 December 2014 30 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 02 April 2015 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 02 April 2015 61 days late