Trustees PELSALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 522760

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keir Pedley | Chair | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Gwilliam | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Hinsley | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Orritt | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Langford | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hill | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Langford | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Breeze | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emillia Roberts | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Roberts | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Roberts | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Harvey | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
WENDY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.