Financial history STONNALL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £21.58k £21.79k £23.18k £21.47k £30.35k
Total expenditure £17.78k £14.38k £15.04k £28.17k £44.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.66k £14.43k £9.78k N/A N/A