Financial history ASTON CANTLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £40.43k £37.98k £30.28k £28.78k £42.43k
Total expenditure £28.47k £21.84k £37.62k £48.82k £35.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £17.67k £1.95k £1.00k £900