Financial history BIRCHMOOR RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 522895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £155 £2.07k £155 £155 £0
Total expenditure £1.44k £2.07k £2.05k £1.87k £2.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A