Trustees THE WOLFORDS VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 522957

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES VAN HELDEN | Chair | 07 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robin Swaffield | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Virashni Langstone | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Kate Zielinski | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fionna Margaret Veronica Lesley Pavia Shilling | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Graham | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Isobel Mary Murphy | Trustee | 30 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.