Financial history POLESWORTH RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 522981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £250 £4.17k £250 £155 £0
Total expenditure £4.05k £4.17k £4.61k £4.15k £4.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A