Accounts and annual returns WELLESBOURNE YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 523035
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 25 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 02 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 21 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 06 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required