Financial history BISHAMPTON ABBERTON AND THROCKMORTON VILLAGE HALL AND CHILDRENS PLAYGROUND

Charity Number: 523098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £19.24k £21.59k £19.17k £15.95k £21.53k
Total expenditure £16.02k £17.90k £15.60k £19.13k £20.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.33k £16.34k £2.67k £300 N/A