Accounts and annual returns FECKENHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required