Accounts and annual returns LITTLE WITLEY PARISH HALL

Charity Number: 523165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 10 May 2024 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 10 May 2024 134 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 24 February 2023 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 24 March 2022 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 29 June 2021 182 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required