Trustees OFFENHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 523168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Moclair Chair 25 February 2018
None on record
Ruth Darkins Trustee 17 March 2025
None on record
Gina Jantu Trustee 17 March 2025
None on record
Sarah Jane Propert Trustee 08 March 2022
None on record
Sheila Gladys Briers Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
KELLY PARKINSON Trustee 28 February 2017
None on record
MARTIN GLYN ROBERTS Trustee 25 February 2012
None on record