Accounts and annual returns NORTH CAVE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 February 2024 04 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2023 16 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2022 22 February 2023 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2022 22 February 2023 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 27 February 2021 18 January 2022 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2021 25 January 2022 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 27 February 2020 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2020 Not Required