Financial history STAITHES VILLAGE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 523362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.82k £1.98k £13.35k £12.96k £13.50k
Total expenditure £5.28k £2.99k £3.47k £9.10k £13.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.56k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.10k £2.67k N/A