Accounts and annual returns YARM RECREATION GROUND TRUST

Charity number: 523450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required