Accounts and annual returns DUNSOP BRIDGE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2023 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2023 362 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 February 2022 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 April 2021 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required