Accounts and annual returns CRIDLING STUBBS VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 523563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 17 February 2025 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 12 June 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 24 May 2021 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required