Accounts and annual returns DENBY DALE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 523577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 24 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 24 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window