Accounts and annual returns PWYLLGOR CAE CHWARAE CLWT Y BONT CLWT Y BONT PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 523687
Charity reporting is overdue by 1577 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 482 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 482 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 847 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 847 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1212 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1212 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1577 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1577 days