Financial history NIXON'S WORKMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 524196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.93k £29.90k £26.20k £11.45k £4.18k
Total expenditure £15.07k £5.07k £25.86k £7.63k £1.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A