Accounts and annual returns DINGESTOW PARISH HALL

Charity number: 524337
Charity reporting is up to date (194 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 11 December 2024 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 02 October 2024 490 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 12 September 2022 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 12 September 2022 469 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 September 2022 834 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required