Accounts and annual returns LLANSTEPHAN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 524465
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 February 2015 21 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 February 2015 Not Required
Annual return 10 February 2014 20 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 February 2014 Not Required
Annual return 10 February 2013 28 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 February 2013 Not Required
Annual return 10 February 2012 20 December 2012 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 February 2012 Not Required