Financial history 77TH STOKE-ON-TRENT AND NEWCASTLE (AUDLEY) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £21.25k £25.10k £6.84k £13.54k £10.42k
Total expenditure £19.89k £16.84k £9.68k £9.97k £20.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.67k £16.38k N/A N/A N/A