Financial history 1ST TREVOR BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.56k £24.77k £8.37k £10.91k £7.88k
Total expenditure £8.53k £4.04k £11.40k £11.65k £5.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.00k N/A N/A N/A