Accounts and annual returns COED EVA AND HOLLYBUSH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 525000
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 21 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 21 July 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 24 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 24 December 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 28 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 28 January 2012 On Time