Accounts and annual returns E B JONES TRUST FUND IN CONNECTION WITH BAGILLT MERLLYN COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 525460
Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required