Trustees BUSTARDTHORPE ALLOTMENTS ASSOCIATION CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION
Charity number: 1211930
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cristina Rivas Graver | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Poyner | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan De Val LLB | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Allison Church | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Wherrett | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna May Rogers Mrs | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Steele | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Seddon | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Church | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
George Harte | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.