Accounts and annual returns DAN GEORGE MEMORIAL FUND ICW CYFARTHFA CASTLE GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity number: 525571
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 27 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 11 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required