Accounts and annual returns PRESTEIGNE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL

Charity number: 525705
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 05 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 15 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 04 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required