Financial history ST JOHN'S SCHOOL (NEWTON) TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 525755
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012
Total gross income £948.63k £1.04m £968.93k £922.90k £987.62k
Total expenditure £942.69k £912.08k £959.84k £959.74k £949.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.10k £124.97k £11.15k £14.45k £57.27k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £939.01k £911.37k £957.00k £908.44k £930.27k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £167 £2 £1 £12 £0
Income - Other £1.35k £2.08k £784 £0 £81
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £938.45k £908.05k £955.79k £954.83k £945.36k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.24k £4.03k £4.05k £4.92k £3.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0