Financial history HILLCREST GRAMMAR SCHOOL (BRAMHALL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED )

Charity Number: 525928
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013
Total gross income £1.90m £1.79m £1.55m £1.38m £1.32m
Total expenditure £1.86m £1.91m £1.63m £1.38m £1.39m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.88m £1.79m £1.55m £1.38m £1.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £19.41k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.84m £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £18.06k £1.79m £1.55m £1.31m £1.30m
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £115.50k £80.11k £77.20k £88.74k