Accounts and annual returns SCHOOL (CROMPTON AND RIDGEWAY'S NOW KNOWN AS DEANE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL)

Charity number: 526230
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 07 May 2009 554 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 07 May 2009 919 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required