Accounts and annual returns NEWCHURCH IN ROSSENDALE EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 526470
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2007 28 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2006 30 March 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 30 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required