Accounts and annual returns THE WHITTLE PRIZE FUND (IN CONNEXION WITH THE SOUTHLANDS COUNTY SECONDARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 526586
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required