Financial history MOUNT CARMEL SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 526610
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010
Total gross income £396.61k £404.07k £368.61k £355.01k £269.98k
Total expenditure £411.41k £418.08k £431.88k £395.02k £314.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A