Trustees PIPE-CUM-LYDE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 527269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV Phill Brown Chair 01 September 2018
None on record
Charlotte Compton Trustee 09 August 2022
None on record
sue baker Trustee 26 January 2017
None on record
BRIAN JOY Trustee 11 September 2012
None on record
MAJOR ROBERT EDWARD BARNES TD Trustee 25 November 2011
None on record
AMANDA LOUISE JAMES Trustee 25 November 2011
None on record