Accounts and annual returns KIDDERMINSTER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 527537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 June 2024 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 April 2022 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 April 2022 452 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required