Accounts and annual returns JOHN BRYAN

Charity number: 527975
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 15 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 22 February 2011 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 23 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 23 January 2009 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required