Accounts and annual returns OLD NATIONAL SCHOOL

Charity Number: 528371
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 11 April 2011 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted