Accounts and annual returns CANNOCK CHASE MINING AND TECHNICAL COLLEGE STUDENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 528640
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2016 21 August 2017 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 23 May 2016 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required