Accounts and annual returns THE PATRICK CHARLES PEEK RUGBY SCHOOL MAINTENANCE TRUST

Charity Number: 528753
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2007 08 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2006 13 March 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2005 25 May 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2004 17 March 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2004 Not Required