Financial history G O BELL AWARD ADMINISTERED IN CONNEXION WITH TEMPLE MOOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 529213
Charity reporting is overdue by 1462 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018
Total gross income £107 £95 £95 £95 £95
Total expenditure £420 £0 £0 £150 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A