Financial history DOROTHY BAIRSTOW PRIZE FUND ICW DONCASTER HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRLS

Charity number: 529419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A