Financial history MIDDLETON SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 529524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.20k £5.20k £4.93k £1.27k £3.91k
Total expenditure £1.32k £660 £555 £2.70k £3.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A