Charity overview PHOEBE AND ANN PORTER (ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH)
Charity number: 210174-13
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 26 MARCH 1884 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 14 AUGUST 1961 AND 1 DECEMBER 1975 AND RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
SUBJECT TO PAYMENT OF REPAIRS AND OTHER CHARGES AND TO COSTS FOR REPAIRING AND MAINTAINING VAULTS AND MONUMENTS IN PARISH CHURCH OF FULHAM INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FULHAM
Registration history
- 29 October 1962: Standard registration
- 08 March 2000: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.