Charity overview THOMAS ALMOND
Charity number: 211584-1
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 5 FEBRUARY 1884 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 29 OCTOBER 1964 AND 24 NOVEMBER 1966
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF POOR OF THE PARISH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BLACKMORE
Registration history
- 20 December 1962: Standard registration
- 04 September 2001: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.